NH HB345 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/10/2021; Chapter 70; Eff: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a license for mushroom harvesters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a license for mushroom harvesters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 174 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/10/2021; Chapter 70; Eff: 07/01/2022
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 128
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/27/2021); Senate Journal 18
2021-05-06SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-15SenateRemote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0239h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-174 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 67
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0239h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 67
2021-02-25HouseSpecial Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
2021-02-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0239h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 29
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback