NH HB343 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2305h for Jan 8 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to laws regarding pawnbrokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to laws regarding pawnbrokers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2305h for Jan 8 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-04House==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-10-03HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-10-03House==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-09-26HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/3/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/26/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-07-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2013-05-15HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/23/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2013-02-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.192

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback