NH HB343 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Lay on the Table (Rep Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-137; House Journal 26, PG.798-800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a permanent state defense force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a permanent state defense force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-15 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP BALDASARO) (Y: 175 N: 137 NV: 86 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-15 House Lay on the Table (Rep Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-137; House Journal 26, PG.798-800
2011-03-10 House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.553
2011-03-10 House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.553
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-03-01 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-02-02 House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Executive Departments & Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 183

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback