NH HB341 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - House Signed by the Governor 06/09/2010; Effective 08/08/2010; Chapter 0121
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - House Signed by the Governor 06/09/2010; Effective 08/08/2010; Chapter 0121
Summary
Relative to the date selected for the presidential primary election.
Title
Relative to the date selected for the presidential primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | House Signed by the Governor 06/09/2010; Effective 08/08/2010; Chapter 0121 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/28/10; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Hearing: April 20, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Election Law and Veterans' Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.259 | |
2010-01-13 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2524h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.385 | |
2010-01-13 | House Amendment #2524h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.385 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-30 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2524h; House Calendar 1, PG.11 | |
2009-11-30 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2524h for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 15-0); House Calendar 2, PG.93 | |
2009-10-22 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/17/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-10-21 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/17/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/4/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-09-29 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 =DATE CHANGE (Orig 10/14/09)= | |
2009-02-26 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-01-29 | House ==ROOM CHANGE== Executive Session: 2/4/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 (Orig Legislative Office Building 101) | |
2009-01-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-01-21 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.224 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=801&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |