NH HB340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 273-78 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 273-78 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of residential property.
Title
Relative to the transfer of residential property.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Adjutant [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Tony Caplan [D] | Rep. Maria Perez [D] |
Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 273 N: 78 NV: 31 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 273 N: 78 NV: 31 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 273 N: 78 NV: 31 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 273-78 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 61 |
2023-02-10 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Adjutant, A. Murray, Read, Gallager, Seibert, McWilliams, Caplan, Bolton, Staub, Damon) 02/09/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB340-FN 02/01/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 12 |