NH HB340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB340
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ownership of property by a managed asset trust.
Title
Relative to ownership of property by a managed asset trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB340 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)