NH HB338 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-75; House Journal 16, PG. 328-330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-75; House Journal 16, PG. 328-330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nomination of candidates for United States senator.
Title
Relative to nomination of candidates for United States senator.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Lars Christiansen [R] | Rep. Susan DeLemus [R] |
Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 252 N: 75 NV: 68 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-75; House Journal 16, PG. 328-330 |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 16, PG. 298 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 175 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 217 |