NH HB338 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state contribution for water pollution control.
Title
Relative to the state contribution for water pollution control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-10 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305 |
2013-10-10 | House | ==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.192 |