NH HB337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB337
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2018; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2018; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal regulations of small wind energy systems.
Title
Relative to municipal regulations of small wind energy systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 01/26/2018; Chapter 2; Eff. 03/27/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Enrolled 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 48 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 01/03/2018); Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 9 |
Same As/Similar To
HB337 (Carry Over) 2017-11-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass