NH HB335 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to notice of federal motor carrier safety regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to notice of federal motor carrier safety regulations.



2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 74
2017-03-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Dyer) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/22/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments