NH HB335 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-135; House Journal 21, PG.485-487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-135; House Journal 21, PG.485-487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the tobacco tax.
Title
Relative to the tobacco tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - ITL (Y: 207 N: 135 NV: 25 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-135; House Journal 21, PG.485-487 |
2013-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 15, PG.275 |
2013-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.275 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.192 |