NH HB335 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing multi-use number plates.
Title
Establishing multi-use number plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.310 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1658s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 15 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1658s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2011-03-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.991 | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.569 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 203 3:00 PM or immediately after House session | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Transportation; House Journal 11, PG. 182 |