NH HB331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a forfeiture of personal property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a forfeiture of personal property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
2021-04-29SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
2021-04-29SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
2021-04-21SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/29/2021; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-01SenateRemote Hearing: 04/06/2021, 01:00 PM; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0188h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 12
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0188h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 12
2021-02-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0188h (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 9
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/26/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94597513398 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=409&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB331
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=409&txtFormat=html
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=409
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=335&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0331&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB331&ddlsponsors=&lsr=409
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=343&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0331&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB331&ddlsponsors=&lsr=409
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=344&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0331&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB331&ddlsponsors=&lsr=409

Bill Comments

feedback