NH HB331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the duties of a veterinarian.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the duties of a veterinarian.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/19/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback