NH HB331 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the standard of review for government requirements on commercial enterprises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the standard of review for government requirements on commercial enterprises.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 12
2017-02-16HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6
2017-02-02HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25House==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-17House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback