NH HB331 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-26 - Signed by Governor Hassan 01/26/2016; Chapter 3; Effective 3/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to absences among selectmen on election day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to absences among selectmen on election day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-26HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 01/26/2016; Chapter 3; Effective 3/26/2016
2016-01-21HouseEnrolled 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 34
2016-01-21SenateEnrolled (In recess 01/14/2016); Senate Journal 3
2016-01-06SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
2015-11-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
2015-04-30SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 12
2015-04-17Senate=== RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2015-04-13Senate=== CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-26SenateHearing: 4/2/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2015-03-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2015-03-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565
2015-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 349
2015-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 217

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback