NH HB331 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to wine manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wine manufacturers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2013-11-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 2
2013-10-04House==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-09-25House==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-09-25House=New Date= Retained Bill-Subcommittee Work Session Joint with House Enviroment and Agriculture: 10/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.192

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback