NH HB331 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 09/13/2011; Chapter 0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to posting agency expenditures on the state transparency website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to posting agency expenditures on the state transparency website.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 09/13/2011; Chapter 0075
2011-05-04 House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490
2011-05-04 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318
2011-04-27 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14
2011-04-27 Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.277
2011-04-21 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/27/11; Senate Calendar 21
2011-04-14 Senate Hearing: 4/21/11, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20
2011-03-30 Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0110h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.798
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0110h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.798
2011-03-03 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0110h; House Calendar 23, PG.602-603
2011-03-03 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0110h for Mar 15 (Vote 11-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.553
2011-02-24 House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 2:00 PM or 45 mins after House session Legislative Office Building 306
2011-02-24 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/1/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-01-26 House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 182

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback