NH HB330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 227; Section 2 Effective 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 227; Section 2 Effective 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an oversight commission for medical cost transparency.
Title
Establishing an oversight commission for medical cost transparency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 227; Section 2 Effective 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1949s (Rep Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1949s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1949s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1949s, 6/4/15; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/24/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-11 | House | Second Committee Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f); House Journal 16, PG. 317 |
2015-02-11 | House | Refer to Finance |
2015-02-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0158h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 303 |
2015-02-11 | House | Adopt Amendment #0158h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 303 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0158h for Feb 11 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 174 |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 217 |