NH HB330 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to carrying firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to carrying firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-15 - House - OTP/AM 0637H AND 0811H (Y: 244 N: 109 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-11 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
2011-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23
2011-04-14 Senate Hearing: 4/20/11, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20
2011-03-30 Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendments #0637h and #0811h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 244-109; House Journal 26, PG.767-771
2011-03-15 House Floor Amendment #2011-0811h (Rep Welch) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.769
2011-03-15 House Floor Amendment #2011-0775h (New Title) (Rep Burt) Failed, Division Vote 41-261; House Journal 26, PG.768-769
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0637h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.767-768
2011-03-09 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0637h; House Calendar 23, PG.601-602
2011-03-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0637h for Mar 15 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.548-549
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-03-01 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 204 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session
2011-02-16 House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Orig 1:30 PM)
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 182

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback