NH HB328 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 290-76 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 290-76 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act legalizing certain controlled substances for persons 21 years of age or older.
Title
An act legalizing certain controlled substances for persons 21 years of age or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 290 N: 76 NV: 10 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 290 N: 76 NV: 10 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 290 N: 76 NV: 10 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 290-76 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2023-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB328-FN 02/24/2023 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 03:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 11 |