NH HB328 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 166; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 166; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to delivery of absentee ballots.
Title
Relative to delivery of absentee ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 166; Effective Date 8/25/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1908s (Rep Hoelzel): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1812 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1908s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass with Amendment |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Sen. Pierce moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2015-1908s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Special Order HB 328 to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Special Order HB 328 to 5/21/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Order HB 328 to 5/14/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 206-129; House Journal 24, PG. 879-880 |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 422 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 217 |