NH HB328 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire domestic liquor and wines.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire domestic liquor and wines.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Blankenbeker [R] | Rep. Timothy Comerford [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Lawrence Perkins [R] |
Rep. Robert Willette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/26/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-07 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 =Banking Div= | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-01-11 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.528 | |
2011-10-28 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 11 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2200 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-09-06 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/11/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 9/6/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-24 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 4:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Commerce & Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 182 |