NH HB327 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Summary
Requiring that voters show identification when personally delivering absentee ballots to town and city clerks.
Title
Requiring that voters show identification when personally delivering absentee ballots to town and city clerks.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Rep. Beth Folsom [R] | Rep. David Love [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-01-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB327 10/29/2021 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 30 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 01:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB327 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=530&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB327 |