NH HB326 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2380h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2380h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of polysomnographers by the board of respiratory care practitioners.
Title
Relative to licensure of polysomnographers by the board of respiratory care practitioners.
Sponsors
Rep. James Devine [R] | Rep. Joseph Hagan [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Elisabeth Sanders [R] |
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2380h |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-29 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/6/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-09-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-09-13 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-08-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/12/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Conituned Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-30 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.191 |