NH HB324 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the valuation of utility property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the valuation of utility property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-07-31HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-08HouseRetained in Committee
2017-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2017 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-25HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 8

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback