NH HB320 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1052s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a civics competency assessment as a high school graduation requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a civics competency assessment as a high school graduation requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Committee Amendment 1052s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 141 NV: 8 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 141 NV: 13 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1052s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1052s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1052s, 04/08/2021; Senate Calendar 18
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-25HouseOught to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-141 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 22
2021-02-25HouseAmendment # 2021-0271h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 22
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0271h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 27
2021-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95029670134
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93534264563 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day time permitting from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=357&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB320
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=359&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=359
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=359
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=48&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0320&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB320&ddlsponsors=&lsr=357
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=48&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0320&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB320&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0357
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=297&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0320&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB320&ddlsponsors=&lsr=357
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=298&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0320&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB320&ddlsponsors=&lsr=357

Bill Comments

feedback