NH HB317 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-07 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the public utilities commission from increasing the system benefits charge without legislative approval.
Title
Prohibiting the public utilities commission from increasing the system benefits charge without legislative approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2483h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-26 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 11/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment #2017-2459h: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-28 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-07-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-02-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 8 |
Same As/Similar To
HB317 (Carry Over) 2017-11-07 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate