NH HB314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB314
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 314 Become Law: Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 314 Become Law: Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensing requirements for autonomous vehicle testing and establishing an automated and connected vehicle testing and deployment commission.
Title
Relative to licensing requirements for autonomous vehicle testing and establishing an automated and connected vehicle testing and deployment commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 279 N: 66 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2058c (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 279 N: 66 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2058c (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 314 Become Law: Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-09-13 | House | Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Regular Calendar 279-66 by Required Two-Thirds Vote |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2102e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2102e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2058c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2058c; Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Adopted; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2058c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Gray Replaces Senator Gannon; |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator Birdsell; |
2018-05-14 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gannon, Cavanaugh; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, True, Sykes 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1646s and 1832s and Requests CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1646s and 2018-1832s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1832s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1646s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1646s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 314 from the Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1646s, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2447h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 44 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2447h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 44 |
2017-10-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2447h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-10-03 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/27/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-08-23 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-04-26 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 05/03/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 8 |
Same As/Similar To
HB314 (Carry Over) 2017-10-26 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2447h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)