NH HB312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 51; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 51; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to deadlines in consumer credit applications, licensing requirements for mortgage loan originators, examinations of family trust companies, delegation by credit union boards to committees, qualifications of the banking commissioner, and authorizing depository banks to elect benefit corporation status.
Title
Relative to deadlines in consumer credit applications, licensing requirements for mortgage loan originators, examinations of family trust companies, delegation by credit union boards to committees, qualifications of the banking commissioner, and authorizing depository banks to elect benefit corporation status.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 51; Eff: 07/24/2021 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/13/2021); Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0093h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0093h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0093h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 4 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/09/2021 01:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94408830780 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following linksTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98678901926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43 |