NH HB312 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0162; Section 1 Effective 7/01/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0162; Section 1 Effective 7/01/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting the collection of biometric data by state agencies, municipalities, and political subdivisions, and requiring the election of benefits by certain members of the judicial retirement plan or their beneficiaries.
Title
Restricting the collection of biometric data by state agencies, municipalities, and political subdivisions, and requiring the election of benefits by certain members of the judicial retirement plan or their beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Joel Winters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0162; Section 1 Effective 7/01/2014; Remainder Effective 7/11/14. |
2014-06-25 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled (6/4/14) |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2022eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2022e Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1954c, Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1954c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1954c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 3:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Cataldo, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Weber, Schuett, Goley, Hatch |
2014-05-22 | House | Rep. Wallner moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1836s, New Title, 1877s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2014-1877s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2014-1836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 312 from the Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 5/6/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2240h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Amendment #2240h Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2240h for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/19/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-07-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.191 |