NH HB309 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures for foreclosure of a mortgage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures for foreclosure of a mortgage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-11SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0735h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0735h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0735h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback