NH HB309 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 225; Section 1 Effective 1/1/2016, Section 2 Effective as Provided in Section 3, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 225; Section 1 Effective 1/1/2016, Section 2 Effective as Provided in Section 3, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting landlords to remove tenants property in certain circumstances and relative to the committee to study issues concerning parking for those with walking disabilities.
Title
Permitting landlords to remove tenants property in certain circumstances and relative to the committee to study issues concerning parking for those with walking disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 225; Section 1 Effective 1/1/2016, Section 2 Effective as Provided in Section 3, Remaining Effective 7/13/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendments #1952s and #2003s (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1952s, and 2003s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2015-2003s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1952s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved to Remove HB 309 from the Consent Calendar |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1952s, 6/4/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 5/12/15, Room 100, State House, 9:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0429h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 793-794 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0429h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 793-794 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0429h for Mar 11 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 403 |
2015-02-25 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-11 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 217 |