NH HB307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 9; Eff: 05/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to driver's license photographs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to driver's license photographs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 9; Eff: 05/10/2019
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-13SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8
2019-01-31HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 6
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback