NH HB307 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the membership and duties of the legislative youth advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the membership and duties of the legislative youth advisory council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 390
2015-02-26HouseContinued Executive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 206
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/4/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 217

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback