NH HB306 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 93; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 93; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to revenue estimates while operating under emergency orders caused by the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Relative to revenue estimates while operating under emergency orders caused by the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 93; Eff: 08/30/2021 |
2021-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-0944s (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 20 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0944s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0944s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0944s, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/22/2021, 09:10 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0318h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 20 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0318h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 20 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0318h (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 14 |
2021-02-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99928276230 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95843569442 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 43 |