NH HB305 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exceptions for violations related to Presidential Executive Orders governing the keeping or bearing of arms.
Title
Relative to exceptions for violations related to Presidential Executive Orders governing the keeping or bearing of arms.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Mannion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 7 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB305 03/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 10 |