NH HB305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the duties of the registers of probate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the duties of the registers of probate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2019-11-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-09-24HouseExecutive Session: 10/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-06-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 06/25/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-09House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building208
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback