NH HB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 23; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 23; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required pay.
Title
Relative to required pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 23; Eff: 07/05/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/22/2021); Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 101 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0189h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0189h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0189h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 9 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96195399441 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 42 |