NH HB303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certification of building code compliance inspectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certification of building code compliance inspectors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-03SenateHearing: 04/10/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0267h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 12
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0267h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 12
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0267h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 6
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback