NH HB303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to statewide assessment standards and relative to parental consent for psychological services to students.
Title
Relative to statewide assessment standards and relative to parental consent for psychological services to students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Table (Y: 230 N: 127 NV: 40 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 129 N: 227 NV: 41 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 129 N: 227 NV: 41 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 230-127; House Journal 24, PG. 869-871 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0622h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 129-227; House Journal 24, PG. 867-869 |
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 166-169; House Journal 24, PG. 867 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0622h |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 420 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |