NH HB302 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the creation and use of electronic records by government agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the creation and use of electronic records by government agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/31/2021, 09:10 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback