NH HB301 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a parent to elect not to include their child in the unique pupil identification system or other information database maintained by the department of education.
Title
Allowing a parent to elect not to include their child in the unique pupil identification system or other information database maintained by the department of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2538h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 17-18 |
2015-10-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-10-19 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |