NH HB301 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice of sale in foreclosure proceedings.
Title
Relative to notice of sale in foreclosure proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1231s Not Voted On; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Special Order HB 301 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; Voice Vote; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Remove HB 301 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1231s, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.329 |
2013-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.209 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.191 |