NH HB298 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 222-95; House Journal 26, PG. 1204-1206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 222-95; House Journal 26, PG. 1204-1206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the seasons for taking game animals and game birds with the use of bait.
Title
Relative to the seasons for taking game animals and game birds with the use of bait.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 222 N: 95 NV: 81 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 222-95; House Journal 26, PG. 1204-1206 |
2015-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0415h (NT) |
2015-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 426 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |