NH HB293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to employee credit privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employee credit privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Table (Y: 145 N: 212 NV: 9 Abs: 34) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved Ought to Pass; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Report: No Recommendation, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 9
2019-03-20HouseLay on Table (Rep. Flanagan): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 145-212 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 9
2019-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 28
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback