NH HB292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 225-159 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to including brokers fees in the calculation of the insurance premium tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to including brokers fees in the calculation of the insurance premium tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 225 N: 159 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseVeto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 225-159 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 17
2019-06-20HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 06/19/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-19SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 19A
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 3
2019-03-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 3
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0074h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0074h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0074h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 16
2019-01-29House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-15House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building302
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback