NH HB292 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 191; Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the good Samaritan law to engineers and architects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the good Samaritan law to engineers and architects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 235 N: 105 NV: 28 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-07HouseSigned by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 191; Effective 7/6/2015
2015-06-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2135
2015-06-24SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-17HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2106EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1992
2015-06-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2106e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-03HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment #1861s (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted DV 248-112; House Journal 44, PG. 1813
2015-05-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1861s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment 1861s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-05-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1861s, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2015-04-21SenateHearing: 4/28/15, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19
2015-03-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0210h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-105; House Journal 26, PG. 1215-1217
2015-03-12HouseLay on Table (Rep Ammon): Motion Failed DV 119-206; House Journal 26, PG. 1215
2015-03-12HouseAmendment #0210h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1214-1215
2015-02-26HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-02-26HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0210h for Mar 11 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 427
2015-02-25HouseContinued Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-11HouseContinued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED==
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 216

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback