NH HB292 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0231; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to registration fees for commercial, private, and pleasure vessels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to registration fees for commercial, private, and pleasure vessels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-26 - House - OTP (Y: 238 N: 66 NV: 52 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - OTPA (Y: 164 N: 127 NV: 71 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - Table (Y: 126 N: 165 NV: 71 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - Adopt 13-2269h (Y: 171 N: 120 NV: 71 Abs: 31) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-22HouseSigned by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0231; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
2014-05-28HouseEnrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014)
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled
2014-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13
2014-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18
2014-05-01SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 11
2014-04-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16
2014-04-16SenateHearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2014-03-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to Transportation
2014-03-26HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-66
2014-03-25HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sylvia)
2014-03-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
2014-02-24HouseExecutive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Time Change)
2014-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/6/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-02-19HousePublic Hearing: 3/6/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means
2014-01-29HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2269h(NT) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 164-127
2014-01-29HouseLay on Table (Rep. Vaillancourt) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 126-165
2014-01-29HouseAdopt Amendment #2269h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 171-120
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2269h, New Title (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-10House==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305
2013-10-10House==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-10-01HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/8/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-08-23HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-05-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-12HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.190

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=519&sy=2014&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2014/HB0292.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=51&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0292&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=519
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=52&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0292&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=519
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=53&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0292&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=519
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=195&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0292&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=519

Bill Comments 750

feedback