NH HB292 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring milfoil decals on private vessels registered in other states or countries and operating on the inland waters of New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring milfoil decals on private vessels registered in other states or countries and operating on the inland waters of New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2269h for Jan 8 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-10House==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305
2013-10-10House==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-10-01HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/8/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-08-23HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-05-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-12HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.190

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback